MI SB0434 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Assigned Pa 395'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Assigned Pa 395'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans; ombudsman; veterans' ombudsman; provide oversight of veterans' facilities. Amends sec. 1 of 2016 PA 198 (MCL 4.771).
Title
Veterans; ombudsman; veterans' ombudsman; provide oversight of veterans' facilities. Amends sec. 1 of 2016 PA 198 (MCL 4.771).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 793 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 321 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 321 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Assigned Pa 395'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2018 @ 2:56 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/19/2018 @ 12:37 Pm |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/17/2018 @ 4:22 Pm |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 793 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2017-07-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-07-12 | House | Received On 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 321 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |