MI SB0412 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Assigned Pa 0081'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Assigned Pa 0081'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; hunting; wild turkey license fee; modify use. Amends sec. 43524 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43524).
Title
Natural resources; hunting; wild turkey license fee; modify use. Amends sec. 43524 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43524).
Sponsors
Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] | Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] |
Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 175 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 143 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 595 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 143 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 595 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0081'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/11/2012 @ 3:46 Pm |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 4/10/2012 @ 8:20 Am |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/2/2012 @ 1:09 Pm |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Roll Call # 175 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-03-29 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-03-28 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-03-28 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-03-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 143 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-03-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-03-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-03-27 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-03-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-10-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2011-10-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-26 | House | Received On 10/26/2011 |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 595 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-10-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |