MI SB0402 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-07 - Assigned Pa 0147'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental protection; sewage; maximum total grant for municipalities; increase. Amends sec. 5204e of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5204e).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental protection; sewage; maximum total grant for municipalities; increase. Amends sec. 5204e of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5204e).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 389 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 315 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-07SenateAssigned Pa 0147'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-11-07SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 11/2/2017 @ 1:28 Pm
2017-11-07SenateApproved By Governor 11/2/2017 @ 12:38 Pm
2017-10-31SenatePresented To Governor 10/30/2017 @ 2:39 Pm
2017-10-17SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-10-17SenateFull Title Agreed To
2017-10-17SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-10-17SenateHouse Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 389 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-10-11HouseReturned To Senate
2017-10-11HouseInserted Full Title
2017-10-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2017-10-11HouseRead A Third Time
2017-10-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-10-10HouseAmended
2017-10-10HouseRead A Second Time
2017-10-04HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-10-04HouseReported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
2017-07-12HouseReferred To Committee On Natural Resources
2017-07-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-07-12HouseReceived On 06/28/2017
2017-06-28SenatePassed Roll Call # 315 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2017-06-28SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-06-28SenateRules Suspended
2017-06-28SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-06-28SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-06-15SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-06-15SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-06-15SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-05-24SenateReferred To Committee On Natural Resources
2017-05-24SenateIntroduced By Senator Phillip Pavlov

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0402
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0147.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-06-15-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-06-28-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-04-073.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-11-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-10-17-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback