MI SB0400 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-14 - Assigned Pa 0082'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure: expunction; time period required to elapse before applying to expunge operating while intoxicated conviction; provide for. Amends sec. 1d of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4219'21, HB 4220'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: expunction; time period required to elapse before applying to expunge operating while intoxicated conviction; provide for. Amends sec. 1d of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4219'21, HB 4220'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 238 (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 122 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-14SenateAssigned Pa 0082'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-09-14SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 09/10/2021 10:10 Am
2021-09-14SenateApproved By Governor 09/10/2021 08:23 Am
2021-09-09SenatePresented To Governor 09/02/2021 01:01 Pm
2021-08-31SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-31SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2021-05-27SenatePostponed For The Day
2021-05-26HouseReturned To Senate
2021-05-26HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 238 Yeas 91 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2021-05-26HouseRead A Third Time
2021-05-18HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-05-18HouseRead A Second Time
2021-05-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-05-11HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-05-05HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2021-05-05HouseRead A First Time
2021-05-05HouseReceived On 05/05/2021
2021-05-05SenatePassed Roll Call # 122 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-05-04SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-05-04SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-05-04SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-05-04SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-04-28SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2021-04-28SenateIntroduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0400
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0400.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0400.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0400.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0082.htm
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0400-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4219-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0400-8CF34DCB.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0400-3CE138FE.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0400-7A448A77.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-813A3759.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-04-038.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-05-039.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-11-041.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-26-048.htm

Bill Comments

feedback