MI SB0393 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0057'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0057'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; tax increment financing; tax increment finance authorities into a single act; provide for. Creates new act & repeals (See bill).
Title
Economic development; tax increment financing; tax increment finance authorities into a single act; provide for. Creates new act & repeals (See bill).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 69 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 60 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 550 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 60 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 550 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0057'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/14/2018 @ 1:02 Pm |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/13/2018 @ 11:46 Am |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/1/2018 @ 1:59 Pm |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 69 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2018-02-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Title Amended |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 60 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2018-02-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-08 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-02-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Received On 12/13/2017 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 550 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kenneth Horn |