MI SB0389 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Presented To Governor 07/11/2024 01:46 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

State management: escheats; unclaimed property of military personnel; modify dormancy periods. Amends secs. 5, 6, 7, 8, 13, 15, 17 & 18 of 1995 PA 29 (MCL 567.225 et seq.) & adds sec. 17a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State management: escheats; unclaimed property of military personnel; modify dormancy periods. Amends secs. 5, 6, 7, 8, 13, 15, 17 & 18 of 1995 PA 29 (MCL 567.225 et seq.) & adds sec. 17a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 190 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 8 (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 542 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-30SenatePresented To Governor 07/11/2024 01:46 Pm
2024-06-26SenateOrdered Enrolled
2024-06-26SenateFull Title Agreed To
2024-06-26SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2024-06-20HouseReturned To Senate
2024-06-20HouseInserted Full Title
2024-06-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 190 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2024-06-20HouseVote Reconsidered
2024-06-20HouseRule Suspended
2024-02-13HouseDefeated Roll Call # 8 Yeas 52 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
2024-02-13HouseRead A Third Time
2024-02-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2024-02-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-02-13HouseRead A Second Time
2024-02-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-02-06HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2023-10-18HouseReferred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
2023-10-18HouseRead A First Time
2023-10-18HouseReceived On 10/18/2023
2023-10-18SenatePassed Roll Call # 542 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2023-10-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2023-10-17SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2023-10-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2023-10-05SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2023-10-05SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2023-06-14SenateReferred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
2023-06-14SenateIntroduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-SB-0389
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2023-SIB-0389.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBS-0389.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBH-0389.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2023-SNB-0389.htm
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-SCVBS-0389-00B74.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-SCVBS-0389-00D47.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0388-G.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0388-F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0388-C.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0388-U.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0388-2A904D22.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0388-80C3BB08.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-10-05-085.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-10-18-090.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-02-06-011.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-02-13-013.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-06-20-056.htm

Bill Comments

feedback