MI SB0386 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; making false representation about military status; prohibit under certain circumstances and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 286.
Title
Crimes; other; making false representation about military status; prohibit under certain circumstances and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 286.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 364 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-06-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-29 | House | Received On 06/29/2011 |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 364 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |