MI SB0372 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-25 - Assigned Pa 0069'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-25 - Assigned Pa 0069'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Communications: telecommunications; requirement for distribution of printed directory; modify. Amends sec. 309 of 1991 PA 179 (MCL 484.2309).
Title
Communications: telecommunications; requirement for distribution of printed directory; modify. Amends sec. 309 of 1991 PA 179 (MCL 484.2309).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 (Y: 81 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 250 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 250 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-25 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0069'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/29/2021 11:06 Am |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/29/2021 09:32 Am |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/21/2021 10:44 Am |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2021-06-30 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-06-30 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2021-06-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 Yeas 81 Nays 28 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-06-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology |
2021-06-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-03 | House | Received On 06/03/2021 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 250 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ken Horn |