MI SB0342 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 196'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 196'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land use; land division; deed statement and form providing notice of transfer of the right to make unallocated divisions; clarify references to the number of divisions transferred. Amends sec. 109 of 1967 PA 288 (MCL 560.109).
Title
Land use; land division; deed statement and form providing notice of transfer of the right to make unallocated divisions; clarify references to the number of divisions transferred. Amends sec. 109 of 1967 PA 288 (MCL 560.109).
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 407 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 234 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 234 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 196'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/13/2017 @ 1:04 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/13/2017 @ 11:08 Am |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/6/2017 @ 3:35 Pm |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-11-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-11-29 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-11-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 407 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-06 | House | Received On 06/06/2017 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 234 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |