MI SB0342 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Assigned Pa 0092'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Assigned Pa 0092'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; checkoff; contributions to Michigan Amber alert fund; provide check-off option. Amends sec. 435 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.435).
Title
Individual income tax; checkoff; contributions to Michigan Amber alert fund; provide check-off option. Amends sec. 435 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.435).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 263 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 263 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 209 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 263 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 209 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0092'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/28/2013 @ 3:57 Pm |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/28/2013 @ 10:10 Am |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/20/2013 @ 10:54 Am |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 263 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2013-06-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-06-11 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2013-06-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-06-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-06-06 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2013-06-06 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2013-06-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-05-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-22 | House | Received On 05/22/2013 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 209 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |