MI SB0304 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation; tobacco; cigarette tax; modify. Amends secs. 7 & 12 of 1993 PA 327 (MCL 205.427 & 205.432).
Title
Taxation; tobacco; cigarette tax; modify. Amends secs. 7 & 12 of 1993 PA 327 (MCL 205.427 & 205.432).
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hune [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 879 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 709 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 709 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2018 @ 3:26 Pm |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 879 Yeas 65 Nays 44 |
2018-12-18 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 709 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Joe Hune |