MI SB0289 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Assigned Pa 0089'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Assigned Pa 0089'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: brownfield redevelopment authority; tax capture revenues; modify. Amends secs. 2, 8a, 11, 13, 13b, 13c, 14a, 15 & 16 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2652 et seq.).
Title
Economic development: brownfield redevelopment authority; tax capture revenues; modify. Amends secs. 2, 8a, 11, 13, 13b, 13c, 14a, 15 & 16 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2652 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 391 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 (Y: 90 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 265 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 (Y: 90 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 265 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-20 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0089'23 With Immediate Effect |
2023-07-20 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2023 10:36 Am |
2023-07-20 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/18/2023 11:40 Am |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 02:18 Pm |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 391 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-27 | Senate | House Substitute (h-4) Concurred In |
2023-06-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-06-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2023-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 Yeas 90 Nays 19 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-06-20 | House | Substitute (h-4) Adopted |
2023-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-06-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-06-14 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted And Amended |
2023-06-14 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2023-06-14 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2023-06-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-06-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-06-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business |
2023-05-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-16 | House | Received On 05/11/2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 265 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss |