MI SB0288 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Assigned Pa 0105'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Human services: services or financial assistance; Michigan energy assistance program sunset; repeal. Repeals sec. 6 of 2012 PA 615 (MCL 400.1236).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human services: services or financial assistance; Michigan energy assistance program sunset; repeal. Repeals sec. 6 of 2012 PA 615 (MCL 400.1236).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 321 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-22SenateAssigned Pa 0105'23 With Immediate Effect
2023-08-22SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 07/27/2023 09:42 Am
2023-08-22SenateApproved By Governor 07/26/2023 11:54 Am
2023-07-18SenatePresented To Governor 07/17/2023 10:49 Am
2023-06-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2023-06-27SenateFull Title Agreed To
2023-06-27SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2023-06-22HouseReturned To Senate
2023-06-22HouseInserted Full Title
2023-06-22HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 Yeas 87 Nays 22 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2023-06-22HouseRead A Third Time
2023-06-21HousePlaced On Third Reading
2023-06-21HouseRead A Second Time
2023-06-21HouseReferred To Second Reading
2023-06-21HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2023-05-24HouseReferred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology
2023-05-24HouseRead A First Time
2023-05-24HouseReceived On 05/24/2023
2023-05-24SenatePassed Roll Call # 321 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2023-05-24SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2023-05-24SenateRules Suspended
2023-05-24SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2023-05-24SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2023-05-24SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2023-05-24SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2023-04-25SenateReferred To Committee On Energy And Environment
2023-04-25SenateIntroduced By Senator Sam Singh

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-SB-0288
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2023-SIB-0288.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBS-0288.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBH-0288.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2023-SNB-0288.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/publicact/htm/2023-PA-0105.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0288-G.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0288-F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0288-119169D8.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0288-F31D4585.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0288-39B01FA9.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0288-A5379DC1.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0288-N.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-05-24-050.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-06-21-058.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-06-22-059.htm

Bill Comments

feedback