MI SB0287 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - Assigned Pa 0111'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - Assigned Pa 0111'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; carriers; applicability of exemptions; modify. Amends sec. 2, art. V of 1933 PA 254 (MCL 479.2).
Title
Transportation; carriers; applicability of exemptions; modify. Amends sec. 2, art. V of 1933 PA 254 (MCL 479.2).
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Kowall [R] | Sen. Joseph Hune [R] | Sen. Phillip Pavlov [R] | Sen. John Brandenburg [R] |
Sen. John Gleason [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 370 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 362 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 241 (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 253 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 362 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 241 (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 253 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-24 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0111'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/20/2011 @ 1:14 Pm |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/20/2011 @ 11:32 Am |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Presented To Governor 7/6/2011 @ 2:22 Pm |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-06-29 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 370 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Postponed Temporarily |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2011-06-29 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 362 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-29 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-06-28 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-06-28 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-06-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 241 Yeas 90 Nays 18 |
2011-06-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-23 | House | Amended |
2011-06-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2011-05-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2011-05-26 | House | Received On 05/25/2011 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 253 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |