MI SB0286 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 0172'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health facilities; other; nurse aide training and registration program; establish. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding pt. 219.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health facilities; other; nurse aide training and registration program; establish. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding pt. 219.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 459 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 294 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 293 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-28SenateAssigned Pa 0172'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-11-28SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 11/21/2017 @ 3:38 Pm
2017-11-28SenateApproved By Governor 11/20/2017 @ 11:18 Am
2017-11-28SenatePresented To Governor 11/16/2017 @ 3:44 Pm
2017-11-09SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-11-09SenateFull Title Agreed To
2017-11-09SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-11-09Senate Roll Call # 459 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2017-11-09SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2017-11-02HouseReturned To Senate
2017-11-02HouseInserted Full Title
2017-11-02HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 Yeas 106 Nays 2
2017-11-02HouseRead A Third Time
2017-11-01HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-11-01HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2017-11-01HouseRead A Second Time
2017-10-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-10-11HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-07-12HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2017-07-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-07-12HouseReceived On 06/22/2017
2017-06-22SenatePassed Roll Call # 294 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-06-22SenateVote Reconsidered
2017-06-22SenatePassed Roll Call # 293 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 1
2017-06-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-06-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-04-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-04-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-04-19SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-03-29SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2017-03-29SenateIntroduced By Senator Hoon-yung Hopgood

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0286
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0286.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0286.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0286.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0286.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0172.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-04-19-036.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-06-22-062.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-11-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-11-02-086.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-11-09-094.htm

Bill Comments

feedback