MI SB0280 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: initiative and referendum; time frame for the board of state canvassers to complete the canvass of an initiative petition; provide for and clarify. Amends secs. 471 & 477 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.471 & 168.477).
Title
Elections: initiative and referendum; time frame for the board of state canvassers to complete the canvass of an initiative petition; provide for and clarify. Amends secs. 471 & 477 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.471 & 168.477).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 463 (Y: 55 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 358 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 358 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 10/15/2021 |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/13/2021 09:08 Am |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2021-10-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-10-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2021-10-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 463 Yeas 55 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-10-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-09-30 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2021-09-30 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-09-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-09-30 | House | Received On 09/30/2021 |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 358 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ruth A. Johnson |
Subjects
Elections: election officials
Elections: initiative and referendum
Elections: petitions
State agencies (existing): state
Elections: initiative and referendum
Elections: petitions
State agencies (existing): state