MI SB0277 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0230'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0230'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land use: farmland and open space; continued PA 116 enrollment; allow for farmland during deferment period of use for commercial solar facilities. Amends secs. 36101 & 36104a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.36101 & 324.36104a) & adds secs. 36104c & 36104e.
Title
Land use: farmland and open space; continued PA 116 enrollment; allow for farmland during deferment period of use for commercial solar facilities. Amends secs. 36101 & 36104a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.36101 & 324.36104a) & adds secs. 36104c & 36104e.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 675 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-11-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 457 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 457 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-29 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0230'23 |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/29/2023 01:08 Pm |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/28/2023 01:22 Pm |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:30 Am |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-11-08 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 675 Yeas 22 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2023-11-03 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-11-03 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2023-11-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2023-11-03 | House | Amended |
2023-11-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-11-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-11-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-09-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology |
2023-09-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-09-26 | House | Received On 09/26/2023 |
2023-09-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 457 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-09-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kristen Mcdonald Rivet |