MI SB0275 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 195'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 195'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; prostitution; exemption from prosecution of law enforcement officers from criminal prosecution for certain prostitution offenses committed while the officer is working; modify. Amends sec. 451a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.451a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4355'17
Title
Crimes; prostitution; exemption from prosecution of law enforcement officers from criminal prosecution for certain prostitution offenses committed while the officer is working; modify. Amends sec. 451a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.451a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4355'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 479 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 (Y: 91 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 115 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 (Y: 91 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 115 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 195'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/13/2017 @ 1:02 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/13/2017 @ 11:06 Am |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/8/2017 @ 11:36 Am |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Roll Call # 479 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2017-11-30 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-11-30 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-11-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 Yeas 91 Nays 17 |
2017-11-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-29 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-04-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received On 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 115 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Judith Emmons |
Subjects
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct
Crimes: prostitution
Law enforcement: investigations
Law enforcement: local police
Law enforcement: state police
Crimes: prostitution
Law enforcement: investigations
Law enforcement: local police
Law enforcement: state police