MI SB0271 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0235'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0235'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Energy: alternative sources; energy storage, clean energy, and increased renewable energy; set targets for. Amends title, heading of subpt. A of pt. 2, secs. 1, 3, 5, 7, 9, 11, 13, 22, 28, 29, 39, 45, 47, 49, 173, 177 & 191 of 2008 PA 295 (MCL 460.1001 et seq.) & adds secs. 32, 51, 53, 101 & 103.
Title
Energy: alternative sources; energy storage, clean energy, and increased renewable energy; set targets for. Amends title, heading of subpt. A of pt. 2, secs. 1, 3, 5, 7, 9, 11, 13, 22, 28, 29, 39, 45, 47, 49, 173, 177 & 191 of 2008 PA 295 (MCL 460.1001 et seq.) & adds secs. 32, 51, 53, 101 & 103.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 674 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-11-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 486 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 629 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 486 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 629 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-29 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0235'23 |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/29/2023 01:18 Pm |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/28/2023 02:24 Pm |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:28 Am |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 674 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-11-08 | Senate | House Substitute (h-5) Concurred In |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2023-11-03 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-11-03 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2023-11-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 486 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2023-11-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-11-03 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-11-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-11-03 | House | Substitute (h-5) Adopted And Amended |
2023-11-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-11-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-11-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology |
2023-10-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-31 | House | Received On 10/27/2023 |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 629 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Erika Geiss |