MI SB0267 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Assigned Pa 0100'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Assigned Pa 0100'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; other; student safety act; repeal sunset. Amends enacting section 1 of 2013 PA 183.
Title
Law enforcement; other; student safety act; repeal sunset. Amends enacting section 1 of 2013 PA 183.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 251 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 240 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 240 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-06 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0100'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/13/2017 @ 3:30 Pm |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/13/2017 @ 12:29 Pm |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 7/11/2017 @ 2:44 Pm |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-06-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 251 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-08 | House | Received On 06/08/2017 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 240 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Judith Emmons |