MI SB0265 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-07 - Assigned Pa 0145'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-07 - Assigned Pa 0145'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fireworks; other; administration of Michigan fireworks safety fund; modify. Amends sec. 11 of 2011 PA 256 (MCL 28.461). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0264'17
Title
Fireworks; other; administration of Michigan fireworks safety fund; modify. Amends sec. 11 of 2011 PA 256 (MCL 28.461). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0264'17
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 303 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 178 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 178 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-07 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0145'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/2/2017 @ 1:24 Pm |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/2/2017 @ 12:34 Pm |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/30/2017 @ 2:35 Pm |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-10-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-10-11 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-10-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 303 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2017-10-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-05-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-09 | House | Received On 05/09/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 178 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |