MI SB0257 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services
Pending: House Families And Children's Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services
Pending: House Families And Children's Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; central repository pertaining to death of a child; create. Amends sec. 7b of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.627b).
Title
Children; protection; central repository pertaining to death of a child; create. Amends sec. 7b of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.627b).
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Birkholz [R] | Sen. Alan Cropsey [R] | Rep. Judson Gilbert [R] | Sen. Bill Hardiman [R] |
Sen. Mark Jansen [R] | Sen. Roger Kahn [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Randy Richardville [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services | |
2009-03-19 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-19 | Received On 03/19/2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Passed Roll Call # 64 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-03-18 | Substitute S-2 Concurred In | |
2009-03-18 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-03-12 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-03-12 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-02-18 | Referred To Committee On Families And Human Services |
Subjects
Children, protection
Health, children
Health, death
Records, death
State agencies (existing), human services
Health, children
Health, death
Records, death
State agencies (existing), human services