MI SB0254 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; department of transportation; provide for fiscal year 2009-2010. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; department of transportation; provide for fiscal year 2009-2010. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-10-13 | Postponed For The Day | |
2009-10-13 | Assigned Pa 0116'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-10-13 | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/12/2009 @ 4:12 Pm | |
2009-10-13 | Approved By Governor With Line Item(s) Vetoed 10/12/2009 @ 1:20 Pm | |
2009-10-01 | Presented To Governor 9/30/2009 @ 11:32 Pm | |
2009-09-30 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-09-30 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2009-09-30 | Re-returned To Senate | |
2009-09-30 | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 475 Yeas 108 Nays 0 | |
2009-09-30 | Rule Suspended | |
2009-09-30 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2009-09-30 | Conference Report Received | |
2009-09-30 | Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 486 Yeas 28 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-09-30 | Conference Report Received In Senate | |
2009-09-17 | Referred To Conference Committee 09/16/2009 | |
2009-09-17 | House Conferees Named 09/16/2009: Reps. Lee Gonzales Richard Leblanc Dave Agema | |
2009-07-15 | Senate Conferees Named 07/15/2009: Sens. Bill Hardiman Alan Cropsey Glenn Anderson | |
2009-07-15 | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute H-1 | |
2009-07-15 | Senate Named Conferees 07/15/2009: Sens. Bill Hardiman, Alan Cropsey, Glenn Anderson | |
2009-06-24 | Roll Call # 341 Yeas 2 Nays 33 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-06-24 | Substitute H-1 Nonconcurred In | |
2009-06-24 | Returned To Senate | |
2009-06-24 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 332 Yeas 96 Nays 13 | |
2009-06-24 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-06-24 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-24 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-06-24 | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended | |
2009-06-24 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-06-24 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-06-24 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-06-11 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-06-11 | Read A First Time | |
2009-06-11 | Received On 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Passed Roll Call # 242 Yeas 22 Nays 12 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-06-11 | Amendment(s) Adopted | |
2009-06-11 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2009-06-11 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-11 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-06-11 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-06-11 | Substitute S-2 Concurred In | |
2009-06-11 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-04-01 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-04-01 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-04-01 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-02-18 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |