MI SB0251 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned Pa 0034'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned Pa 0034'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: fishing; commercial fishing regulations; modify. Amends secs. 47309, 47311 & 47315 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.47309 et seq.).
Title
Natural resources: fishing; commercial fishing regulations; modify. Amends secs. 47309, 47311 & 47315 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.47309 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] | Sen. Jon Bumstead [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] | Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] |
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] | Rep. Curtis VanderWall [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 89 (Y: 95 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 288 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 288 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0034'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/15/2022 11:48 Am |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Approved By Governor 03/15/2022 11:08 Am |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Presented To Governor 03/07/2022 12:47 Pm |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-03-02 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 89 Yeas 95 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2021-06-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-17 | House | Received On 06/17/2021 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 288 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |