MI SB0248 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Assigned Pa 0097'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Assigned Pa 0097'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans; other; World War I centennial commission; create. Creates new act.
Title
Veterans; other; World War I centennial commission; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 285 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 105 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 105 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-06 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0097'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/13/2017 @ 3:24 Pm |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/13/2017 @ 12:23 Pm |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 7/11/2017 @ 2:38 Pm |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Roll Call # 285 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2017-06-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-06-20 | House | Title Amended |
2017-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-15 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2017-06-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2017-04-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-19 | House | Received On 04/19/2017 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 105 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
State agencies (proposed): boards and commissions
Veterans: other
State agencies (proposed): boards and commissions
Veterans: other