MI SB0243 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; department of energy, labor, and economic growth; provide for fiscal year 2009-2010. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; department of energy, labor, and economic growth; provide for fiscal year 2009-2010. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Jansen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-11-04 | Postponed For The Day | |
2009-11-04 | Assigned Pa 0130'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-11-04 | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/30/2009 @ 11:23 Am | |
2009-11-04 | Approved By Governor With Line Item(s) Vetoed 10/29/2009 @ 4:40 Pm | |
2009-10-21 | Presented To Governor 10/20/2009 @ 1:20 Pm | |
2009-10-20 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-10-20 | Reconsider Vote Withdrawn | |
2009-10-01 | Postponed Temporarily | |
2009-10-01 | Immediate Effect Reconsidered | |
2009-10-01 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2009-09-30 | Immediate Effect Postponed | |
2009-09-30 | Immediate Effect Defeated | |
2009-09-25 | Re-returned To Senate | |
2009-09-25 | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 454 Yeas 94 Nays 14 | |
2009-09-25 | Rule Suspended | |
2009-09-25 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2009-09-25 | Conference Report Received | |
2009-09-24 | Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 472 Yeas 21 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-09-24 | Conference Report Received In Senate | |
2009-09-17 | Referred To Conference Committee 09/16/2009 | |
2009-09-17 | House Conferees Named 09/16/2009: Reps. Richard Hammel Jon Switalski Bill Rogers | |
2009-07-15 | Senate Conferees Named 07/15/2009: Sens. Mark Jansen Thomas George Martha Scott | |
2009-07-15 | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute H-1 | |
2009-07-15 | Senate Named Conferees 07/15/2009: Sens. Mark Jansen, Thomas George, Martha Scott | |
2009-06-24 | Roll Call # 339 Yeas 1 Nays 34 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-06-24 | Substitute H-1 Nonconcurred In | |
2009-06-23 | Returned To Senate | |
2009-06-23 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 Yeas 108 Nays 0 | |
2009-06-23 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-06-23 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-23 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-06-23 | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended | |
2009-06-23 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-06-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-06-10 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-04-01 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-04-01 | Read A First Time | |
2009-04-01 | Received On 04/01/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Passed Roll Call # 90 Yeas 21 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-04-01 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2009-04-01 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-04-01 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-04-01 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended | |
2009-04-01 | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In | |
2009-04-01 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) | |
2009-04-01 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-04-01 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-04-01 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-02-18 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |