MI SB0228 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0177'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0177'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health: suicide; suicide prevention commission; provide for. Creates new act.
Title
Health: suicide; suicide prevention commission; provide for. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 349 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 57 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 57 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0177'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 01:22 Pm |
2019-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/20/2019 11:52 Am |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/13/2019 01:15 Pm |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 349 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | House Substitute (h-3) Concurred In |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-09-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-09-24 | House | Title Amended |
2019-09-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 Yeas 97 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-09-24 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2019-09-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-09-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-09-19 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted And Amended |
2019-09-19 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-09-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-09-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-09-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-05-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-08 | House | Received On 05/08/2019 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 57 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Runestad |
Subjects
Health: suicide
Legislature: legislative agencies
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
State agencies (existing): state police
Legislature: legislative agencies
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
State agencies (existing): state police