MI SB0226 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0261'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil procedure; service of process; fees and mileage allowed for service of process; modify. Amends sec. 2559 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2559).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure; service of process; fees and mileage allowed for service of process; modify. Amends sec. 2559 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2559).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 522 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 66 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05SenateAssigned Pa 0261'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-09-05SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 6/28/2018 @ 2:54 Pm
2018-09-05SenateApproved By Governor 6/27/2018 @ 10:44 Pm
2018-07-25SenatePresented To Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:44 Pm
2018-06-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-12SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-06-12SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-06-12HouseReturned To Senate
2018-06-12HouseInserted Full Title
2018-06-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 522 Yeas 103 Nays 6
2018-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2018-06-12HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-06-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-06-12HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-22HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-22HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-02-13HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-02-13HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-13HouseReceived On 02/13/2018
2018-02-13SenatePassed Roll Call # 66 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-02-06SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2018-02-06SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2018-02-06SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2018-01-31SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2018-01-31SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-01-31SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2017-03-09SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2017-03-09SenateIntroduced By Senator Rick Jones

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0226
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0226.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0226.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0226.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0226.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0261.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-01-31-010.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-02-13-015.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-22-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-06-12-059.htm

Bill Comments

feedback