MI SB0209 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0459'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0459'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; portion of highway M-10 in Wayne County; designate as "Sergeant Collin Rose Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 10a.
Title
Highways; name; portion of highway M-10 in Wayne County; designate as "Sergeant Collin Rose Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 10a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 915 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 531 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 531 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0459'18 |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 3:48 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:33 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2018 @ 2:50 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 915 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 531 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Coleman Young |