MI SB0191 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; security guards; citation to security guard laws in state identification statute; revise. Amends sec. 8 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.298).
Title
Occupations; security guards; citation to security guard laws in state identification statute; revise. Amends sec. 8 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.298).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 94 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-03-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-29 | House | Received On 03/29/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 94 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |
Subjects
Occupations: business licensing and registration
Occupations: security guards
Records: public
State agencies (existing): state
Occupations: security guards
Records: public
State agencies (existing): state