MI SB0190 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative procedure; contested cases; award of costs and fees to prevailing party in a case involving this state; remove certain restrictions. Amends sec. 123 of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.323).
Title
Administrative procedure; contested cases; award of costs and fees to prevailing party in a case involving this state; remove certain restrictions. Amends sec. 123 of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.323).
Sponsors
Sen. David Robertson [R] | Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] |
Sen. Judith Emmons [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 342 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-06-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-31 | House | Received On 05/31/2016 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 342 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Robertson |
Same As/Similar To
HB4378 (Same As) 2015-03-25 - Printed Bill Filed 03/25/2015