MI SB0181 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Assigned Pa 0135'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Assigned Pa 0135'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; other; definition of livestock in Michigan penal code; modify citation. Amends sec. 50 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.50). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0174'19
Title
Animals; other; definition of livestock in Michigan penal code; modify citation. Amends sec. 50 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.50). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0174'19
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 322 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 280 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 280 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0135'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/21/2019 04:26 Pm |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/21/2019 10:55 Am |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/14/2019 01:56 Pm |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-11-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-11-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2019-11-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 322 Yeas 106 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-11-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-11-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-11-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-10-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2019-10-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-24 | House | Received On 10/24/2019 |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 280 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dan Lauwers |