MI SB0171 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Assigned Pa 0158'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Assigned Pa 0158'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education: graduation requirements; certain requirements for high school diploma; modify. Amends sec. 1278a of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278a).
Title
Education: graduation requirements; certain requirements for high school diploma; modify. Amends sec. 1278a of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278a).
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 39 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 39 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0158'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/17/2020 11:46 Am |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Approved By Governor 09/17/2020 10:31 Am |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Presented To Governor 09/14/2020 01:02 Pm |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-09-09 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-09-09 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 Yeas 67 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-07-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-07-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2020-02-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-11 | House | Received On 02/11/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 39 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |