MI SB0166 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-09 - Assigned Pa 0127'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-09 - Assigned Pa 0127'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; other; commercial quadricycle; define, and exclude from definition of "motor vehicle". Amends sec. 33 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.33) & adds sec. 7b. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0165'15
Title
Vehicles; other; commercial quadricycle; define, and exclude from definition of "motor vehicle". Amends sec. 33 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.33) & adds sec. 7b. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0165'15
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] | Sen. David Knezek [D] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Sen. Rebekah Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 269 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 179 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 179 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-09 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0127'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/15/2015 @ 4:44 Pm |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/15/2015 @ 11:06 Am |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Presented To Governor 7/10/2015 @ 3:07 Pm |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-06-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-06-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 269 Yeas 100 Nays 9 |
2015-06-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-06-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-06-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2015-05-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-05-14 | House | Received On 05/14/2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 179 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |
Same As/Similar To
HB4227 (Same As) 2015-02-25 - Printed Bill Filed 02/25/2015