MI SB0166 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Passed on December 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0255'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Passed on December 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0255'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; other; certain driver responsibility fees; eliminate. Amends sec. 732a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732a).
Title
Traffic control; other; certain driver responsibility fees; eliminate. Amends sec. 732a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 719 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 483 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 434 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 483 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 434 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0255'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2011 @ 11:30 Am |
2011-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/13/2011 @ 3:14 Pm |
2011-12-07 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/6/2011 @ 2:00 Pm |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 719 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2011-12-01 | Senate | House Substitute H-8 Concurred In |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-11-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-11-10 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-11-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 483 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2011-11-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-11-09 | House | Substitute H-8 Adopted And Amended |
2011-11-09 | House | Substitute H-5 Not Adopted |
2011-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-10-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-10-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 |
2011-06-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2011-06-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-30 | House | Received On 06/30/2011 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 434 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2011-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |