MI SB0163 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Assigned Pa 0098'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Assigned Pa 0098'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; wetlands; permit exemptions for wetlands and inland lakes and streams; revise, modify certain permit fees, provide for certain general permits, and require more information from department justifying denial of any part 13 permits. Amends secs. 1307, 1311, 30103, 30104, 30105, 30305, 30306, 30306b, 30311, 30311a, 30311d, 30312, 30312d, 30321 & 32513 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.1307 et seq.); adds secs. 30101a & 30328 & repeals (See bill).
Title
Natural resources; wetlands; permit exemptions for wetlands and inland lakes and streams; revise, modify certain permit fees, provide for certain general permits, and require more information from department justifying denial of any part 13 permits. Amends secs. 1307, 1311, 30103, 30104, 30105, 30305, 30306, 30306b, 30311, 30311a, 30311d, 30312, 30312d, 30321 & 32513 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.1307 et seq.); adds secs. 30101a & 30328 & repeals (See bill).
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Green [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Roger Kahn [R] | Sen. John Brandenburg [R] |
Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 261 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 261 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 213 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 261 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 213 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0098'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/2/2013 @ 4:42 Pm |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/2/2013 @ 3:32 Pm |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/21/2013 @ 10:10 Am |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 261 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2013-06-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 Yeas 66 Nays 42 |
2013-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-06-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-06-12 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2013-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-06-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2013-05-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-22 | House | Received On 05/22/2013 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 213 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Defeated |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Green |
Subjects
Agriculture, other
Drains, maintenance and improvement
Highways, other
Natural resources, mining
Natural resources, rivers and streams
Natural resources, wetlands
State agencies (existing), environmental quality
Drains, maintenance and improvement
Highways, other
Natural resources, mining
Natural resources, rivers and streams
Natural resources, wetlands
State agencies (existing), environmental quality