MI SB0143 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Assigned Pa 0018'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Liquor: spirits; definition of mixed spirit drink; modify. Amends sec. 609 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1609). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0141'21, SB 0144'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liquor: spirits; definition of mixed spirit drink; modify. Amends sec. 609 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1609). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0141'21, SB 0144'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 173 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 83 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateAssigned Pa 0018'21
2021-05-26SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 05/25/2021 02:48 Pm
2021-05-26SenateApproved By Governor 05/24/2021 12:42 Pm
2021-05-18SenatePresented To Governor 05/17/2021 12:02 Pm
2021-05-11SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-05-11SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2021-05-11SenateEnrollment Vacated
2021-05-11SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-05-11SenateFull Title Agreed To
2021-05-06HouseReturned To Senate
2021-05-06HouseInserted Full Title
2021-05-06HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 173 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2021-05-06HouseRead A Third Time
2021-05-05HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-05-05HouseRead A Second Time
2021-04-20HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-04-20HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-03-25HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2021-03-25HouseRead A First Time
2021-03-25HouseReceived On 03/25/2021
2021-03-25SenatePassed Roll Call # 83 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-03-24SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-03-24SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-03-24SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-03-24SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2021-03-24SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced By Senator Jeremy Moss

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0143
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0143.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0143.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0143.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0143.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0018.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0143-00B74.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0141-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0141-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0141-D33DE0A6.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0141-F024D300.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0141-7C3B4A02.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0141-ECB25C9C.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0141-FB2A0FE4.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-03-24-027.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-03-25-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-04-20-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-06-040.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback