MI SB0135 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Read A First Time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; department of health and human services; provide for fiscal year 2017-2018. Creates appropriations act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; department of health and human services; provide for fiscal year 2017-2018. Creates appropriations act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 156 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-04HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2017-05-04HouseReceived On 05/04/2017
2017-05-03SenatePassed Roll Call # 156 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2017-05-03SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-05-03SenateRules Suspended
2017-05-03SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 As Amended
2017-05-03SenateSubstitute S-3 As Amended Concurred In
2017-05-03SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 And Amendment(s)
2017-05-03SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3
2017-05-03SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-05-03SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-3
2017-02-09SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced By Senator James Marleau

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback