MI SB0124 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; driver training; training component for drivers regarding safety for bicyclists and other vulnerable roadway users on the road; require. Amends sec. 37 of 2006 PA 384 (MCL 256.657).
Title
Vehicles; driver training; training component for drivers regarding safety for bicyclists and other vulnerable roadway users on the road; require. Amends sec. 37 of 2006 PA 384 (MCL 256.657).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 336 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Received On 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 336 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |
Same As/Similar To
HB4198 (Same As) 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 277'18