MI SB0118 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 0051'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 0051'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: registration plates; blue star family registration plates; create. Amends sec. 803e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.803e).
Title
Vehicles: registration plates; blue star family registration plates; create. Amends sec. 803e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.803e).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 74 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 69 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 169 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 69 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 169 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0051'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/03/2020 04:14 Pm |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Approved By Governor 03/03/2020 12:49 Pm |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 02/24/2020 01:31 Pm |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 74 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In |
2020-02-19 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-02-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 69 Yeas 106 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-08-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2019-08-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-08-28 | House | Received On 08/28/2019 |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 169 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kevin Daley |