MI SB0110 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 585'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 585'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Housing; affordable; incentives for affordable rental housing; allow local units of government to provide. Amends sec. 1 of 1988 PA 226 (MCL 123.411).
Title
Housing; affordable; incentives for affordable rental housing; allow local units of government to provide. Amends sec. 1 of 1988 PA 226 (MCL 123.411).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 873 (Y: 95 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 514 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 514 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 585'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 4:00 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 12:37 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2018 @ 3:12 Pm |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 873 Yeas 95 Nays 14 |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 514 Yeas 32 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |
Subjects
Construction: housing
Housing: affordable
Land use: zoning and growth management
Local government: other
Housing: affordable
Land use: zoning and growth management
Local government: other