MI SB0110 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; scheduling; election of county executive in an optional unified form of county government; modify election schedule to the gubernatorial election years. Amends sec. 9 of 1973 PA 139 (MCL 45.559).
Title
Elections; scheduling; election of county executive in an optional unified form of county government; modify election schedule to the gubernatorial election years. Amends sec. 9 of 1973 PA 139 (MCL 45.559).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 502 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 502 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-12-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2015-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-11-10 | House | Received On 11/10/2015 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 502 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Robertson |
Subjects
Counties: employees and officers
Counties: optional unified form of county government
Elections: scheduling
Counties: optional unified form of county government
Elections: scheduling