MI SB0102 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Assigned Pa 0038'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Assigned Pa 0038'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; other; Michigan community foundation act; create. Creates new act & repeals (See bill).
Title
Property; other; Michigan community foundation act; create. Creates new act & repeals (See bill).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 119 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 74 (Y: 77 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 44 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 74 (Y: 77 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 44 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0038'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/23/2017 @ 10:50 Am |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/23/2017 @ 8:16 Am |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/11/2017 @ 11:06 Am |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Roll Call # 119 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2017-04-26 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 74 Yeas 77 Nays 32 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-04-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-02 | House | Received On 03/02/2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 44 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |
Subjects
Education: intermediate school districts
Education: school districts
Libraries: other
Local government: other
Property: other
Education: school districts
Libraries: other
Local government: other
Property: other