MI SB0083 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred To Conference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred To Conference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: zero budget; K-12 school aid appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022. Amends secs. 11 & 17b of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 & 388.1617b).
Title
Appropriations: zero budget; K-12 school aid appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022. Amends secs. 11 & 17b of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 & 388.1617b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 217 (Y: 0 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 222 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 167 (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 222 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 167 (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Conference Committee |
2021-06-08 | House | House Conferees Named 06/08/2021: Reps. Brad Paquette Annette Glenn Regina Weiss |
2022-11-29 | House | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/27/2021: Sens. Wayne A Schmidt, Jim Stamas, Rosemary Bayer |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Defeated Roll Call # 217 Yeas 0 Nays 36 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Nonconcurred In |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-05-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-05-20 | House | Title Amended |
2021-05-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 222 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-19 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-05-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2021-05-13 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-05-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-13 | House | Received On 05/13/2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 167 Yeas 19 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) As Amended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) As Amended Concurred In |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) And Amendment(s) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |