MI SB0078 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 01/15/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 01/15/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; wildlife; designation under NREPA of areas to achieve or maintain biodiversity; prohibit by DNR and remove biological diversity from list of state forest management goals. Amends secs. 504, 35101, 35501, 35502, 35503 & 52502 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.504 et seq.) & repeals secs. 35504 - 35506 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.35504 - 324.35506).
Title
Natural resources; wildlife; designation under NREPA of areas to achieve or maintain biodiversity; prohibit by DNR and remove biological diversity from list of state forest management goals. Amends secs. 504, 35101, 35501, 35502, 35503 & 52502 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.504 et seq.) & repeals secs. 35504 - 35506 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.35504 - 324.35506).
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. Arlan Meekhof [R] | Sen. David Robertson [R] |
Sen. Michael Green [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Sen. Howard Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 724 (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 37 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 37 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 01/15/2015 |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 9:50 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 724 Yeas 59 Nays 50 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2013-03-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-03-05 | House | Received On 03/05/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 37 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Defeated |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |