MI SB0064 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-23 - Assigned Pa 0139'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-23 - Assigned Pa 0139'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Housing; landlord and tenants; summary proceedings to recover possession of premises; allow after 7-day notice to quit if tenant injures or threatens to injure another individual. Amends sec. 5714 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.5714). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0065'11
Title
Housing; landlord and tenants; summary proceedings to recover possession of premises; allow after 7-day notice to quit if tenant injures or threatens to injure another individual. Amends sec. 5714 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.5714). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0065'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 216 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 471 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 471 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0139'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/22/2012 @ 2:41 Pm |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/22/2012 @ 8:32 Am |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/10/2012 @ 3:42 Pm |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Effect Postponed |
2012-05-03 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-02 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-05-02 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 216 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2012-05-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-09-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-09-07 | House | Received On 09/07/2011 |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 471 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5 |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5 |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2011-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |