MI SB0042 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising registration plate for "Kiwanis International Michigan District"; create, and amend definition of "nonprofit". Amends sec. 811d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.811d) & adds sec. 811gg.
Title
Vehicles; fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising registration plate for "Kiwanis International Michigan District"; create, and amend definition of "nonprofit". Amends sec. 811d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.811d) & adds sec. 811gg.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 17 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-04-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-04-10 | House | Received On 04/10/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 17 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Lucido |