MI SB0039 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: construction and repair; actions against county road commissions for highway defects; clarify that they are subject to governmental immunity act. Amends sec. 21 of 1909 PA 283 (MCL 224.21).
Title
Highways: construction and repair; actions against county road commissions for highway defects; clarify that they are subject to governmental immunity act. Amends sec. 21 of 1909 PA 283 (MCL 224.21).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 493 (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 240 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 240 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Pocket Veto 01/11/2023 |
2022-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/28/2022 02:32 Pm |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-12-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 493 Yeas 88 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 12 |
2022-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-05-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2022-05-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-19 | House | Received On 05/19/2022 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 240 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 1 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Roger Victory |