MI SB0028 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - Assigned Pa 0076'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - Assigned Pa 0076'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; collections; use of credit cards or debit cards as payment option for state taxes; allow. Amends sec. 19 of 1941 PA 122 (MCL 205.19).
Title
Income tax; collections; use of credit cards or debit cards as payment option for state taxes; allow. Amends sec. 19 of 1941 PA 122 (MCL 205.19).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 378 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 246 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 138 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 246 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 138 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-24 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0076'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/12/2011 @ 4:02 Pm |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/12/2011 @ 10:15 Am |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Presented To Governor 7/6/2011 @ 2:36 Pm |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Roll Call # 378 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-29 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2011-06-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-06-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 246 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2011-06-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-28 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2011-06-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-06-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-06-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2011-05-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2011-05-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-05-10 | House | Received On 05/10/2011 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 138 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |