MI SB0021 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0535'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0535'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; other; performance metrics; require of state departments. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 447. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0802'11
Title
State financing and management; other; performance metrics; require of state departments. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 447. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0802'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 758 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 304 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 304 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0535'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 4:24 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 1:21 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 10:34 Am |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 758 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-05-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2012-05-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-03 | House | Received On 05/03/2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 304 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |